Subject | Predicate |
member; Delegation for relations with Estonia, Lithuania and Latvia (1995-07-12--1995-10-08) | lpv:institution |
member; Delegation for relations with Estonia, Lithuania and Latvia (1995-01-18--1995-07-11) | lpv:institution |
member; Delegation for relations with Estonia, Lithuania and Latvia (1994-11-17--1995-07-11) | lpv:institution |
member; Delegation for relations with Estonia, Lithuania and Latvia (1995-01-18--1995-07-11) | lpv:institution |
member; Delegation for relations with Estonia, Lithuania and Latvia (1995-07-12--1997-01-15) | lpv:institution |
member; Delegation for relations with Estonia, Lithuania and Latvia (1995-07-12--1997-01-15) | lpv:institution |
vice-chair; Delegation for relations with Estonia, Lithuania and Latvia (1994-11-17--1995-07-11) | lpv:institution |
vice-chair; Delegation for relations with Estonia, Lithuania and Latvia (1995-07-12--1997-01-15) | lpv:institution |
member; Delegation for relations with Estonia, Lithuania and Latvia (1995-01-18--1995-07-11) | lpv:institution |
member; Delegation for relations with Estonia, Lithuania and Latvia (1995-07-12--1997-01-15) | lpv:institution |
member; Delegation for relations with Estonia, Lithuania and Latvia (1995-01-18--1995-07-11) | lpv:institution |
member; Delegation for relations with Estonia, Lithuania and Latvia (1995-07-12--1997-01-15) | lpv:institution |
member; Delegation for relations with Estonia, Lithuania and Latvia (1995-07-12--1995-10-12) | lpv:institution |
member; Delegation for relations with Estonia, Lithuania and Latvia (1995-07-12--1997-01-15) | lpv:institution |
member; Delegation for relations with Estonia, Lithuania and Latvia (1995-10-12--1997-01-15) | lpv:institution |
member; Delegation for relations with Estonia, Lithuania and Latvia (1994-11-17--1995-07-11) | lpv:institution |
member; Delegation for relations with Estonia, Lithuania and Latvia (1995-10-12--1997-01-15) | lpv:institution |
vice-chair; Delegation for relations with Estonia, Lithuania and Latvia (1995-07-12--1997-01-15) | lpv:institution |
member; Delegation for relations with Estonia, Lithuania and Latvia (1995-10-12--1997-01-15) | lpv:institution |
member; Delegation for relations with Estonia, Lithuania and Latvia (1995-07-12--1997-01-15) | lpv:institution |
member; Delegation for relations with Estonia, Lithuania and Latvia (1994-11-17--1995-07-11) | lpv:institution |
member; Delegation for relations with Estonia, Lithuania and Latvia (1996-11-14--1997-01-15) | lpv:institution |
member; Delegation for relations with Estonia, Lithuania and Latvia (1995-07-12--1997-01-15) | lpv:institution |
member; Delegation for relations with Estonia, Lithuania and Latvia (1995-07-12--1996-11-10) | lpv:institution |
member; Delegation for relations with Estonia, Lithuania and Latvia (1995-07-12--1997-01-15) | lpv:institution |
member; Delegation for relations with Estonia, Lithuania and Latvia (1994-11-17--1995-07-11) | lpv:institution |
member; Delegation for relations with Estonia, Lithuania and Latvia (1995-07-12--1995-10-12) | lpv:institution |
member; Delegation for relations with Estonia, Lithuania and Latvia (1995-01-18--1995-07-11) | lpv:institution |
chair; Delegation for relations with Estonia, Lithuania and Latvia (1995-07-12--1997-01-15) | lpv:institution |
member; Delegation for relations with Estonia, Lithuania and Latvia (1994-11-17--1995-07-11) | lpv:institution |
chair; Delegation for relations with Estonia, Lithuania and Latvia (1994-11-17--1995-07-11) | lpv:institution |
member; Delegation for relations with Estonia, Lithuania and Latvia (1995-10-12--1997-01-15) | lpv:institution |
member; Delegation for relations with Estonia, Lithuania and Latvia (1994-11-17--1995-07-11) | lpv:institution |
member; Delegation for relations with Estonia, Lithuania and Latvia (1995-01-18--1995-07-11) | lpv:institution |
member; Delegation for relations with Estonia, Lithuania and Latvia (1995-07-12--1997-01-15) | lpv:institution |
vice-chair; Delegation for relations with Estonia, Lithuania and Latvia (1994-11-17--1995-07-11) | lpv:institution |
member; Delegation for relations with Estonia, Lithuania and Latvia (1995-07-12--1997-01-15) | lpv:institution |
member; Delegation for relations with Estonia, Lithuania and Latvia (1995-01-18--1995-07-11) | lpv:institution |
member; Delegation for relations with Estonia, Lithuania and Latvia (1995-07-12--1996-11-10) | lpv:institution |
member; Delegation for relations with Estonia, Lithuania and Latvia (1994-11-17--1995-07-11) | lpv:institution |
member; Delegation for relations with Estonia, Lithuania and Latvia (1994-11-17--1995-07-11) | lpv:institution |
member; Delegation for relations with Estonia, Lithuania and Latvia (1995-07-12--1997-01-15) | lpv:institution |
member; Delegation for relations with Estonia, Lithuania and Latvia (1994-11-17--1995-07-11) | lpv:institution |
member; Delegation for relations with Estonia, Lithuania and Latvia (1994-11-17--1995-07-11) | lpv:institution |
member; Delegation for relations with Estonia, Lithuania and Latvia (1995-07-12--1995-10-08) | lpv:institution |
member; Delegation for relations with Estonia, Lithuania and Latvia (1994-11-17--1995-07-11) | lpv:institution |
member; Delegation for relations with Estonia, Lithuania and Latvia (1996-11-14--1997-01-15) | lpv:institution |
member; Delegation for relations with Estonia, Lithuania and Latvia (1996-11-14--1997-01-15) | lpv:institution |
member; Delegation for relations with Estonia, Lithuania and Latvia (1995-07-12--1996-11-10) | lpv:institution |