Subject | Predicate |
member; Delegation for relations with Albania, Bulgaria and Romania (1993-02-11--1994-01-31) | lpv:institution |
substitute; Delegation for relations with Albania, Bulgaria and Romania (1992-02-13--1993-02-10) | lpv:institution |
substitute; Delegation for relations with Albania, Bulgaria and Romania (1992-01-15--1992-02-12) | lpv:institution |
vice-chair; Delegation for relations with Albania, Bulgaria and Romania (1994-02-01--1994-07-18) | lpv:institution |
substitute; Delegation for relations with Albania, Bulgaria and Romania (1993-02-11--1994-01-31) | lpv:institution |
member; Delegation for relations with Albania, Bulgaria and Romania (1994-02-01--1994-07-18) | lpv:institution |
substitute; Delegation for relations with Albania, Bulgaria and Romania (1994-02-01--1994-07-18) | lpv:institution |
member; Delegation for relations with Albania, Bulgaria and Romania (1994-02-01--1994-07-18) | lpv:institution |
member; Delegation for relations with Albania, Bulgaria and Romania (1992-01-15--1993-02-10) | lpv:institution |
substitute; Delegation for relations with Albania, Bulgaria and Romania (1993-02-11--1994-01-31) | lpv:institution |
member; Delegation for relations with Albania, Bulgaria and Romania (1994-02-01--1994-07-18) | lpv:institution |
substitute; Delegation for relations with Albania, Bulgaria and Romania (1992-01-15--1992-02-17) | lpv:institution |
substitute; Delegation for relations with Albania, Bulgaria and Romania (1994-02-01--1994-07-18) | lpv:institution |
member; Delegation for relations with Albania, Bulgaria and Romania (1993-10-26--1994-01-31) | lpv:institution |
substitute; Delegation for relations with Albania, Bulgaria and Romania (1992-01-15--1993-02-10) | lpv:institution |
member; Delegation for relations with Albania, Bulgaria and Romania (1993-02-11--1994-01-31) | lpv:institution |
substitute; Delegation for relations with Albania, Bulgaria and Romania (1992-01-15--1992-03-13) | lpv:institution |
substitute; Delegation for relations with Albania, Bulgaria and Romania (1994-02-01--1994-07-18) | lpv:institution |
member; Delegation for relations with Albania, Bulgaria and Romania (1994-02-01--1994-07-18) | lpv:institution |
substitute; Delegation for relations with Albania, Bulgaria and Romania (1993-02-11--1994-01-31) | lpv:institution |
substitute; Delegation for relations with Albania, Bulgaria and Romania (1992-02-18--1993-02-10) | lpv:institution |
vice-chair; Delegation for relations with Albania, Bulgaria and Romania (1993-02-11--1994-01-31) | lpv:institution |
member; Delegation for relations with Albania, Bulgaria and Romania (1993-07-12--1994-01-31) | lpv:institution |
member; Delegation for relations with Albania, Bulgaria and Romania (1992-01-15--1992-02-12) | lpv:institution |
substitute; Delegation for relations with Albania, Bulgaria and Romania (1993-02-11--1994-01-31) | lpv:institution |
substitute; Delegation for relations with Albania, Bulgaria and Romania (1992-06-11--1993-02-10) | lpv:institution |
member; Delegation for relations with Albania, Bulgaria and Romania (1994-02-01--1994-07-18) | lpv:institution |
member; Delegation for relations with Albania, Bulgaria and Romania (1992-01-15--1992-02-11) | lpv:institution |
substitute; Delegation for relations with Albania, Bulgaria and Romania (1994-02-01--1994-07-18) | lpv:institution |
member; Delegation for relations with Albania, Bulgaria and Romania (1992-01-15--1993-02-10) | lpv:institution |
member; Delegation for relations with Albania, Bulgaria and Romania (1993-02-11--1994-01-31) | lpv:institution |
member; Delegation for relations with Albania, Bulgaria and Romania (1992-01-15--1993-02-10) | lpv:institution |
chair; Delegation for relations with Albania, Bulgaria and Romania (1994-02-01--1994-07-18) | lpv:institution |
member; Delegation for relations with Albania, Bulgaria and Romania (1993-02-11--1993-10-13) | lpv:institution |
member; Delegation for relations with Albania, Bulgaria and Romania (1994-02-01--1994-07-18) | lpv:institution |
member; Delegation for relations with Albania, Bulgaria and Romania (1993-02-11--1994-01-31) | lpv:institution |
member; Delegation for relations with Albania, Bulgaria and Romania (1993-02-11--1994-01-31) | lpv:institution |
member; Delegation for relations with Albania, Bulgaria and Romania (1994-02-01--1994-07-18) | lpv:institution |
substitute; Delegation for relations with Albania, Bulgaria and Romania (1994-02-01--1994-07-18) | lpv:institution |
substitute; Delegation for relations with Albania, Bulgaria and Romania (1992-02-25--1992-11-30) | lpv:institution |
member; Delegation for relations with Albania, Bulgaria and Romania (1992-01-15--1993-02-10) | lpv:institution |
substitute; Delegation for relations with Albania, Bulgaria and Romania (1992-01-15--1993-02-10) | lpv:institution |
substitute; Delegation for relations with Albania, Bulgaria and Romania (1993-02-11--1993-03-30) | lpv:institution |
member; Delegation for relations with Albania, Bulgaria and Romania (1993-02-11--1994-01-31) | lpv:institution |
vice-chair; Delegation for relations with Albania, Bulgaria and Romania (1994-02-01--1994-07-18) | lpv:institution |
member; Delegation for relations with Albania, Bulgaria and Romania (1993-02-11--1994-01-31) | lpv:institution |
member; Delegation for relations with Albania, Bulgaria and Romania (1992-01-15--1993-02-10) | lpv:institution |
member; Delegation for relations with Albania, Bulgaria and Romania (1994-02-01--1994-07-18) | lpv:institution |
substitute; Delegation for relations with Albania, Bulgaria and Romania (1992-01-15--1993-02-10) | lpv:institution |
member; Delegation for relations with Albania, Bulgaria and Romania (1992-01-15--1993-02-10) | lpv:institution |
substitute; Delegation for relations with Albania, Bulgaria and Romania (1993-02-11--1994-01-31) | lpv:institution |
chair; Delegation for relations with Albania, Bulgaria and Romania (1992-02-12--1993-02-10) | lpv:institution |
vice-chair; Delegation for relations with Albania, Bulgaria and Romania (1992-02-12--1993-02-10) | lpv:institution |
member; Delegation for relations with Albania, Bulgaria and Romania (1994-02-01--1994-07-18) | lpv:institution |
member; Delegation for relations with Albania, Bulgaria and Romania (1992-01-15--1993-02-10) | lpv:institution |
member; Delegation for relations with Albania, Bulgaria and Romania (1993-02-11--1994-01-31) | lpv:institution |
chair; Delegation for relations with Albania, Bulgaria and Romania (1993-02-11--1994-01-31) | lpv:institution |
member; Delegation for relations with Albania, Bulgaria and Romania (1993-02-11--1993-04-17) | lpv:institution |
member; Delegation for relations with Albania, Bulgaria and Romania (1992-01-15--1993-02-10) | lpv:institution |
member; Delegation for relations with Albania, Bulgaria and Romania (1992-01-15--1992-02-12) | lpv:institution |
vice-chair; Delegation for relations with Albania, Bulgaria and Romania (1993-02-11--1994-01-31) | lpv:institution |
member; Delegation for relations with Albania, Bulgaria and Romania (1992-01-15--1993-02-10) | lpv:institution |
vice-chair; Delegation for relations with Albania, Bulgaria and Romania (1992-02-12--1993-02-10) | lpv:institution |