Places
Home
Graphs
Prefixes
Admin
Users
Settings
Plugins
Statistics
Repository
Load local file
Load from HTTP
Load from library
Remove triples
Clear repository
RDF quality heuristics
Query
YASGUI SPARQL Editor
Simple Form
SWISH Prolog shell
Help
Documentation
Tutorial
Roadmap
HTTP Services
Login
Local view for "http://purl.org/linkedpolitics/EUmember_1112"
Predicate
Value (sorted:
none
)
lpv
:
politicalFunction
vice-chair; Delegation for relations with the Republics of the Commonwealth of Independent States (CIS) (1994-02-01--1994-07-18)
1
lpv
:
place of birth
"
Ariccia (Roma)
"
@
en
1
lpv
:
countryOfRepresentation
lp
:
Italy
1
foaf
:
name
"
Giulio Cesare Gallenzi
"
1
rdf
:
type
lpv
:
MemberOfParliament
1
lpv
:
profile
?
:
1112.html
1
lpv
:
politicalFunction
vice-chair; Delegation for relations with the Union of Soviet Socialist Republics (1989-07-26--1992-01-14)
1
lpv
:
politicalFunction
member; Delegation for relations with the Republics of the Commonwealth of Independent States (CIS) (1992-01-15--1992-02-04)
1
lpv
:
politicalFunction
substitute; Subcommittee on Security and Disarmament (1992-01-28--1994-07-18)
1
lpv
:
politicalFunction
substitute; Delegation for relations with Albania, Bulgaria and Romania (1992-01-15--1993-02-10)
1
lpv
:
politicalFunction
vice-chair; Delegation for relations with the Republics of the Commonwealth of Independent States (CIS) (1992-02-05--1993-02-10)
1
lpv
:
politicalFunction
vice-chair; Delegation for relations with the Republics of the Commonwealth of Independent States (CIS) (1993-02-11--1994-01-31)
1
lpv
:
politicalFunction
member;
EPP
(1989-07-25--1994-07-18)
1
lpv
:
politicalFunction
unknown; Democrazia cristiana (1989-07-25--1994-07-18)
1
lpv
:
politicalFunction
member; Committee on External Economic Relations (1992-01-15--1994-07-18)
1
lpv
:
politicalFunction
member; Committee on External Economic Relations (1990-01-19--1992-01-14)
1
lpv
:
politicalFunction
substitute;
ECON
(1992-01-15--1994-07-18)
1
lpv
:
politicalFunction
member;
ECON
(1989-07-26--1992-01-14)
1
lpv
:
politicalFunction
substitute; Committee on the Environment, Public Health and Consumer Protection (1989-07-26--1992-01-14)
1
lpv
:
politicalFunction
substitute; Delegation for relations with Albania, Bulgaria and Romania (1993-02-11--1994-01-31)
1
lpv
:
politicalFunction
substitute; Committee on External Economic Relations (1989-07-26--1990-01-18)
1
lpv
:
date of birth
"
1931-11-28
"
^^
xsd
:
date
1
lpv
:
MEP_ID
"
1112
"
1
owl
:
sameAs
?
:
Giulio Cesare Gallenzi
2
lpv
:
gender
"
male
"
@
en
2
lpv
:
name
"
Giulio Cesare Gallenzi
"
@
en
2
lpv
:
politicalFunction
substitute; Delegation for relations with Albania, Bulgaria and Romania (1994-02-01--1994-07-18)
1
Named graphs describing this resource:
1
http://purl.org/linkedpolitics/rdf/MembersOfParliament_background.ttl.gz
2
http://purl.org/linkedpolitics/rdf/mep_wikidata.ttl.gz
The resource does not appear as an object
Context graph